Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Padovani

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cremona, Italy

Titular Bishop of Canopus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1862Born
1884²21.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
29 Apr 190947.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cremona, Italy
29 Apr 190947.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
30 May 190947.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
18 Jun 191452.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Padovani (VIAF: 89226355)
Bishop Antonio Padovani (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePessina Cremonese, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained BishopCremona, Diocese of Cremona

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast