Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Castelnuovo

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1757Born
7 Oct 178124.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 182062.9SelectedBishop of Como, Italy
8 Jan 182163.5ConfirmedBishop of Como, Italy
8 Apr 182163.8Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
23 Dec 183174.5DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Castelnuovo
Bishop Giambattista Castelnuovo (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesana Brianza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1821, Number 7
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast