Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro Carrillo y Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1876Born
10 May 190024.0Ordained PriestPriest of León en Nicaragua
11 Dec 191337.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
11 Dec 191337.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Torone
3 May 191438.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Torone
24 Dec 192448.7AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
16 Apr 193155.0DiedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Isidro Carrillo y Salazar
Bishop Isidro Carrillo y Salazar (born , died ) Bishop of Matagalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón, Diocese of León en Nicaragua
Ordained BishopManagua, Archdiocese of Managua

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 18
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast