Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Davide Carraro, P.I.M.E.

Bishop-Elect of Oran, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1977 Born
27 May 200629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
22 Oct 202346.7AppointedBishop of Oran, Algeria
Jan 2024³46.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Davide Carraro
Father Davide Carraro P.I.M.E. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Oran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSambughé, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Pietro Apostolo, Cathedral, Treviso, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie, Cathedral, Oran, Diocese of Oran

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Oran.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2023
  • bp: CB, 22 Oct 2023
  • c1/loc/ob: AM, 22 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 24 Oct 2023