Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Eduardo Caride

Auxiliary Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Iomnium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1962 Born
5 Dec 198624.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
26 Oct 201856.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina
26 Oct 201856.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
7 Dec 201856.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Eduardo Caride
Bishop Guillermo Eduardo Caride (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Isidro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopGimnasio Juan Pablo II, Colegio Marín, Béccar, Diocese of San Isidro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Isidro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2018
  • c1: CB, 26 Oct 2018
  • ob: CB, 27 Oct 2018
  • c2+: CB, 18 Nov 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,948

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Feb 2021

Quantcast