Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Antonio Cantafora

Bishop Emeritus of Lamezia Terme, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1943 Born
19 Jul 196926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
24 Jan 200460.7AppointedBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy
25 Mar 200460.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy
2 Apr 200460.9InstalledBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy
3 May 201976.0RetiredBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Antonio Cantafora (VIAF: 32151897144124070882)
Bishop Luigi Antonio Cantafora (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamezia Terme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScandale
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Crotone, Archdiocese of Crotone-Santa Severina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lamezia Terme.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,551
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast