Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Calabretta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Noto, Italy

Titular Bishop of Vergi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1896Born
15 Aug 191922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
16 Jul 193639.6AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
24 Aug 193639.7Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
27 Jun 197073.5ResignedBishop of Noto, Italy
27 Jun 197073.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
4 Jan 197578.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Calabretta
Bishop Angelo Calabretta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Noto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAci Platani
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas, Church, Acireale, Diocese of Acireale

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1936, Number 56
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast