Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marco Dino Brogi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Cittą Ducale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1932Born
28 Aug 195725.4First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Apr 196230.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
5 May 196331.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jul 199159.3AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
13 Dec 199765.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cittą Ducale
13 Dec 199765.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sudan
13 Dec 199765.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
6 Jan 199865.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cittą Ducale
5 Feb 200269.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
27 Jan 200673.8RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
29 Nov 202088.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Marco Dino Brogi
Archbishop Marco Dino Brogi O.F.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Egypt, Arab Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria d'Egitto, Vicariate Apostolic of Egitto
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHospital, Careggi, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)La Verna, Franciscan, Cemetery, Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,182
  • d: CB, 30 Nov 2020
  • firs/loc: AM, 23 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 29 Dec 2020

Quantcast