Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Rudolf Bornewasser

Deceased

Bishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1866Born
10 Mar 189427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 Apr 192155.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 Apr 192155.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
29 May 192155.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
27 Feb 192255.9SelectedBishop of Trier, Germany
12 Mar 192256.0ConfirmedBishop of Trier, Germany
18 May 192256.1InstalledBishop of Trier, Germany
4 Jan 194477.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Trier, Germany
20 Dec 195185.7DiedBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Rudolf Bornewasser
Archbishop Franz Rudolf Bornewasser (born , died ) Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadevormwald

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 34
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 87
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 436, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,108, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast