Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Metzroth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1893Born
12 Aug 191622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
12 May 194147.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
12 May 194147.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
8 Jun 194147.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
19 Jan 195157.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Metzroth (VIAF: 308715494)
Bishop Heinrich Metzroth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBingerbrück
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Apostle, Cathedral, Trier, Diocese of Trier

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast