Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Bombera

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hieropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1870Born
5 Jul 189423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
13 Jun 192453.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
5 Oct 192453.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
2 Jan 192756.0DiedTitular Bishop of Hieropolis

MicroData Summary for Josef Bombera
Bishop Josef Bombera (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hieropolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJesenec

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,748
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast