Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Bini, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Khartoum, Sudan

Titular Bishop of Vallis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1886Born
27 Jul 190822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
19 Nov 193044.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Khartoum, Sudan
19 Nov 193044.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
7 Dec 193044.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vallis
1933²46.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kodok, Sudan
1938²51.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of Kodok, Sudan
11 May 195367.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Khartoum, Sudan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Bini
Bishop Francesco Saverio Bini F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Khartoum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedicina, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1930, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast