Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Gerald Berry

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1902Born
11 Jun 192725.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 194542.8AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
7 Jun 194543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
28 Nov 195351.4AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
12 May 196764.9DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gerald Berry
Archbishop Joseph Gerald Berry (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast