Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Germano Bernardini, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1928 Born
21 Mar 195324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 196638.2AppointedSuperior of Trabzon, Turkey
22 Jan 198354.3AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
9 Apr 198354.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
11 Oct 200476.0RetiredArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Germano Bernardini
Archbishop Giuseppe Germano Bernardini O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerica, Italy
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Modena, Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,981
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,090

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast