Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zsigmond József Berényi

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1694Born
12 Mar 171823.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 172833.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
15 Aug 172833.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
4 Dec 173945.2SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
30 Sep 174046.0ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Sep 174854.0DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Zsigmond József Berényi
Bishop Zsigmond József Berényi (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodok
Ordained BishopPresburg

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 253
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,074
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,975

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast