Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon T. Faddoul

Bishop of Our Lady of the Annunciation at Ibadan (Annunciazione) (Maronite), Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1958 Born
9 Aug 198729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
13 Jan 201456.0AppointedApostolic Exarch of Western and Central Africa (Maronite)
28 Feb 201860.1AppointedBishop of Our Lady of the Annunciation at Ibadan (Annunciazione) (Maronite), Nigeria
7 Apr 201860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Our Lady of the Annunciation at Ibadan (Annunciazione) (Maronite), Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Simon T. Faddoul
Bishop Simon T. Faddoul (born ) Bishop of Our Lady of the Annunciation at Ibadan (Annunciazione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDik El Mehdi
Ordained BishopNotre Dame du Liban, Basilica, Harissa, Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Our Lady of the Annunciation at Ibadan (Annunciazione) (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 28 Feb 2018
  • c3: CB, 7 Apr 2018
  • c4: CB, 8 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast