Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Štefan (István) Barnaš

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Conana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1900Born
29 Jun 192525.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 194949.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia
25 Oct 194949.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Conana
5 Nov 194949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Conana
16 Apr 196464.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Štefan (István) Barnaš
Bishop Štefan (István) Barnaš (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpisská Slovenská Ves

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 101
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast