Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Mathias Banzi

Deceased

Bishop of Tanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1946Born
29 Jul 197326.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 199447.6AppointedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
15 Sep 199447.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
20 Dec 202074.1DiedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Anthony Mathias Banzi
Bishop Anthony Mathias Banzi (born , died ) Bishop of Tanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTawa
Ordained BishopTanga, Diocese of Tanga
Death PlaceMuhimbili National, Hospital, Dar-es-Salaam, Diocese of Error [sare]

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,437
  • mn: CB, 14 Sep 2019
  • d: CB, 20 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast