Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Angelo Baldetti

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hieropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1854Born
16 Dec 190147.2AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
29 Jan 190247.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
30 Apr 192368.5ResignedBishop of Cortona, Italy
30 Apr 192368.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
26 Dec 192369.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Angelo Baldetti
Bishop Michele Angelo Baldetti (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Leopoldo della Petraia
Death PlaceFerretto, Diocese of Cortona
Buried Place (Original)Pietraia, Diocese of Cortona

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 7
  • 2h44/loc: AJ, 29 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast