Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jozef Willem Maria Baeten

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Breda, Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1893Born
2 Jun 191724.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 194552.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Breda, Netherlands
27 Oct 194552.5AppointedTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
27 Dec 194552.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
18 Feb 195157.8SucceededBishop of Breda, Netherlands
8 Sep 196168.4ResignedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
8 Sep 196168.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
26 Aug 196471.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Jozef Willem Maria Baeten
Archbishop Jozef Willem Maria Baeten (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Breda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlphen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breda, Diocese of Breda

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1945, Number 68
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast