Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ercole Attuoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1875Born
15 Jul 192954.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pisa, Italy
15 Jul 192954.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
11 Aug 192954.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
16 Mar 193357.9AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
31 May 194166.1DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ercole Attuoni
Archbishop Ercole Attuoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStazzema

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast