Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Arrién (Arrieu)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Titular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1867Born
6 Jun 189022.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Mar 189123.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 191345.8SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
13 Jan 191446.1ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
21 Sep 191446.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
14 Dec 192255.0ResignedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
14 Dec 192255.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
7 Sep 193163.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Victor Arrién (Arrieu)
Archbishop Victor Arrién (Arrieu) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSucre

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,869
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 304
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast