Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Ávila

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1876Born
7 Oct 190024.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
27 Jan 191639.8AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
16 Jul 191640.2Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
30 Jun 191943.2DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Ávila
Bishop Dionisio Ávila (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamataqui, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sucre, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Death PlaceLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 30
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,831
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast