Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop C廥ar 聲gel Vigiani, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Andrapa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1880Born
28 Mar 190323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Jan 192443.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco, Bolivia
21 Jan 192443.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Andrapa
6 Jul 192444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andrapa
23 Jan 195069.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Chaco, Bolivia
24 Apr 196181.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for C廥ar 聲gel Vigiani
Bishop C廥ar 聲gel Vigiani O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgo San Lorenzo, Italy

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations 夗iscopales, Year 1924, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast