Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Angerhausen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Eminentiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1911Born
21 Dec 193524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
27 Jan 195948.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
27 Jan 195948.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eminentiana
12 Apr 195948.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eminentiana
1 Mar 198675.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
22 Aug 199079.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Julius Angerhausen (VIAF: 74291249)
Bishop Julius Angerhausen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarendorf
Ordained BishopEssen, Diocese of Essen

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast