Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Justin Ain Soongie

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Wabag, Papua New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Forma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1973 Born
11 May 200531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
15 Jun 202148.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
15 Jun 202148.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Forma

MicroData Summary for Justin Ain Soongie
Father Justin Ain Soongie (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Wabag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTsikiro
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Church, Tsikiro, Diocese of Wabag

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Wabag.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jun 2021

Quantcast