Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosimo Agostino

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1860Born
28 Jul 191353.2AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
21 Sep 191353.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
1 Jun 191555.1AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
30 Mar 191857.9DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Agostino
Bishop Cosimo Agostino (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMammola
Ordained BishopGerace, Diocese of Gerace

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 53
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 219, and Page 67
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,968

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast