Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Faye, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Ziguinchor

Priest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1905BornSédhiou
26 Oct 192722.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
25 Oct 193126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
31 May 193934.0AppointedPrefect of Ziguinchor, Senegal
194741.6ResignedPrefect of Ziguinchor, Senegal
198781.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Ziguinchor, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Joseph Faye:
Priest Joseph Faye C.S.Sp. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Ziguinchor

  • a priest for 55.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013