Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pio (Claudio) Nesi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Olena


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1901AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
22 Apr 1901AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
2 May 1901DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Pio (Claudio) Nesi
Father Pio (Claudio) Nesi O.F.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast