Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace

Pontificium Consilium de Iustitia et Pace

Suppressed

To: Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Commission for Justice and Peace
6 January 1967ErectedPontifical Commission for Justice and Peace (erected)
Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
28 June 1988ElevatedPontifical Commission for Justice and Peace Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
1 January 2017SuppressedPontifical Council “Cor Unum” (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People (suppressed)
Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.7, 31 Aug 2016; Data: 1 Jan 2017