Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Otto (Lorenz) Hopfenmüller, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Prefect of Assam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1844Born
6 Oct 186622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
188742.5ProfessedPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
13 Dec 188945.5AppointedPrefect of Assam, India
21 Aug 189046.2DiedPrefect of Assam, India

MicroData Summary for Otto (Lorenz) Hopfenmüller
Father Otto (Lorenz) Hopfenmüller S.D.S. (born , died ) Prefect of Assam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeismain, Germany

  • a priest for 23.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast