Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Salvatore van Nuffel, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale}, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1884Born
29 Sep 190218.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jun 190925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Mar 192237.8AppointedPrefect of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale}, South Africa
193954.5DiedPrefect of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Salvatore van Nuffel
Father Salvatore van Nuffel O.S.B. (born , died 1939) Prefect of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 29.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast