Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paulin Renault, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Pro-Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1846Born
28 May 186821.9ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Jun 187024.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1881²34.5AppointedPro-Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China
16 Jun 191367.0DiedPro-Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulin Renault
Father Paulin Renault M.E.P. (born , died ) Pro-Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThilay, Archdiocese of Reims, France
Death PlaceNanning, Prefecture Apostolic of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi)

  • a priest for 43.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast