Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johan Knijf, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Groningen, Netherlands


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1561AppointedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
5 Dec 1563Ordained BishopBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
1 Oct 1578DiedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johan Knijf
Bishop Johan Knijf O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Groningen

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBruxelles
Death PlaceGroningen, Diocese of Groningen

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 205
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast