Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Elías Suárez, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1852Born
1870²17.1ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Sep 187926.8AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
25 Jul 188431.7ResignedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
13 Nov 188533.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elías Suárez
Father Elías Suárez O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMieres, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain
Death PlacePaoay

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast