Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Zhu Hua-yu] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China

Bishop of Wuhu [Wuhu]

Note/Previous Titular See: (Anhui)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1918²Born
1947²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
1983²65.0SelectedBishop of Bengbu [Pengpu, Peng-Fou], China
30 Nov 198668.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bengbu [Pengpu, Peng-Fou], China
1997²79.0AppointedBishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China
1997²79.0AppointedBishop of Wuhu [Wuhu], China
2001²83.0ResignedBishop of Bengbu [Pengpu, Peng-Fou], China
26 Feb 200587.1DiedBishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhu Hua-yu
Bishop Joseph Zhu Hua-yu (born 1918, died ) Bishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeixian
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceHefei City

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast