Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Peter Zhang Shi-zhi] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Mindong)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1916Born
1947²30.1Ordained PriestPriest
1958²41.1AppointedAdministrator of Xiapu [Funing], China
1985²68.1AppointedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
30 Nov 198670.0Ordained BishopBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
5 Aug 200588.7DiedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Zhang Shi-zhi
Bishop Peter Zhang Shi-zhi (born , died ) Bishop of Xiapu [Funing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhangzhuang/Xingtai
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlaceZhangzhuang/Xingtai

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast