Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Philip Xu Lizhi] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1916¹Born
1947²31.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 198771.4Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
19 Jan 199276.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Xu Lizhi
Bishop Philip Xu Lizhi (born 1916, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast