Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Witosławski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Coronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1702³BornCzuków
15 Sep 172624.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
22 Sep 172624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Jan 176865.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Jan 176865.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
24 Apr 176865.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
22 Mar 176966.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michal Witosławski:
Bishop Michal Witosławski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 184
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013