Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph (Ranulf) of Wareham, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1217AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
7 Jan 1218Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
15 Apr 1222DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph (Ranulf) of Wareham
Bishop Ralph (Ranulf) of Wareham O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 239
  • osb: CB, 14 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016