Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustace

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Aug 1197AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
8 Mar 1198Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
3 Feb 1215DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Eustace :
Bishop Eustace (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 52
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013