Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauger

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Aug 1199AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
4 Jun 1200Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
1 Jul 1212DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Mauger :
Bishop Mauger (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 53
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013