Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe von Rudnyánszki

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1788³BornTirnaviae
22 Feb 181223.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Feb 181223.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 184455.8SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
20 Jan 184556.2ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
8 Jun 184556.6Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
14 Mar 185061.4ResignedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
24 Nov 185971.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe von Rudnyánszki:
Bishop Giuseppe von Rudnyánszki (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013