Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro de Vivo

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1828Born
21 Sep 185022.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 187446.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
4 May 187446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
17 May 187446.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
23 Dec 187648.7SucceededBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
15 Feb 189364.9DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro de Vivo (VIAF: 43046313)
Bishop Gennaro de Vivo (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 473, and Page 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,874, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast