Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Xavier Ricardo Vilá y Mateu, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Guam

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1851BornArenys de Mar, Spain
24 Aug 187524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Aug 191160.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
25 Aug 191160.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
1 Oct 191160.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
1 Jan 191361.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier Ricardo Vilá y Mateu:
Bishop Francisco Xavier Ricardo Vilá y Mateu O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Guam

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013