Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Humberto Velázquez Garay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Celaya, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1940BornCuliacán
12 Mar 196423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
10 Feb 198342.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
10 Feb 198342.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Belesasa
4 May 198342.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belesasa
28 Apr 198847.9AppointedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
26 Jul 200363.1ResignedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
22 Jun 201373.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Celaya, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Jesús Humberto Velázquez Garay:
Bishop Jesús Humberto Velázquez Garay (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Celaya

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Jun 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015