Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri-François van der Burch

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1567BornGand
19 Dec 159225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
15 Jun 161244.8SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
1 Oct 161245.1ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 Feb 161345.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
2 May 161648.7AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
23 May 164476.8DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-François van der Burch:
Archbishop Henri-François van der Burch (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131, and Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015