Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe de France

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
22 Dec 161826.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 163442.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
12 Feb 163543.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
15 Jul 163543.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
10 Oct 165967.7DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christophe de France
Bishop Christophe de France (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalines

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast