Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Dauvin

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1560³BornNamur
16 Apr 158827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
28 Mar 161554.8SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
16 Sep 161555.2ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
22 Nov 161555.4Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Sep 162969.2DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Dauvin:
Bishop Jean Dauvin (died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 11 Feb 2015