Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Hennin

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
17 Dec 158025.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 161358.9AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
13 Apr 161459.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
1 Dec 162671.9DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Hennin
Bishop Antoine de Hennin (born 1555, died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValenciennes

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast